OK HB1704 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1704
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Uniform Retirement System for Justice and Judges; Public Employees Retirement System; elected officials; surviving spouse; effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; Uniform Retirement System for Justice and Judges; Public Employees Retirement System; elected officials; surviving spouse; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1704 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 913 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |