OK HB1691 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1691
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the No Jail for Paint Act; modifying abatement procedures; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the No Jail for Paint Act; modifying abatement procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Committee - General Government |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 28 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2017-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1691 (Carry Over) 2017-04-03 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 22 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 22 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |