OK HB1683 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DNA collection procedures; providing for the collection of DNA specimens by certain entity; effective date.
Title
DNA collection procedures; providing for the collection of DNA specimens by certain entity; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2015-02-23 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |