OK HB1674 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; rioting; making certain acts unlawful; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; rioting; making certain acts unlawful; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-14HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-14SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 10
2021-04-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-04-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-03-31SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-03-31SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-03-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-03-22SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-22SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-03-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-03-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18
2021-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Humphrey, McDugle, Steagall
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2021-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2021-02-09HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1674&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1674%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1674%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1674%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1674%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1674%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1674%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1674%20FULLAMD1%20KEVIN%20WEST-GRS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1674%20FA1%20WESTKE-GRS(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1674%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1674%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB1674%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1674%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1674_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1674_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback