OK HB1670 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1670
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; increasing fee amount; effective date.
Title
Courts; increasing fee amount; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Vetoed 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-14 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Thomsen |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 37 |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1670 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2017