OK HB1658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Torts; providing limited malpractice protection for certain health care providers; limiting application to actions filed after a certain date. Effective date.
Title
Torts; providing limited malpractice protection for certain health care providers; limiting application to actions filed after a certain date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read | |
2010-05-17 | To Senate | |
2010-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Tibbs, Walker | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Dorman, Miller, Martin (Scott), Cox, Lamons, Pruett, Sullivan, Ritze, Inman | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Coffee, Anderson, Jolley, Laster | |
2010-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-25 | coauthored by Luttrell, Wesselhoft | |
2010-03-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Luttrell | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Wesselhoft | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 | |
2010-03-03 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2358 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 32 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |