OK HB1642 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; deleting certain offenses subject to mandatory revocation; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; deleting certain offenses subject to mandatory revocation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 |
2013-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2013-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |