OK HB1641 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Trusts; relating to the care of pets; providing for court appointment of trustee in certain circumstance; providing for enforcement of trust. Effective date.
Title
Trusts; relating to the care of pets; providing for court appointment of trustee in certain circumstance; providing for enforcement of trust. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 27 | |
2009-03-03 | Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kiesel, Shumate | |
2009-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Inman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |