OK HB1613 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Larceny; changing and deleting certain penalty provisions; effective date.
Title
Larceny; changing and deleting certain penalty provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 15 |
2023-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-21 | House | Amended |
2023-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1613 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee