OK HB1602 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Data privacy; Oklahoma Computer Data Privacy Act; exemptions; rights to consumer data collection; penalties; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data privacy; Oklahoma Computer Data Privacy Act; exemptions; rights to consumer data collection; penalties; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-03-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Pittman
2021-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11
2021-03-04HouseAmended by floor substitute
2021-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Hilbert, Fugate, Caldwell (Trey)
2021-03-04HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Dills
2021-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-10HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Hicks, Dossett (J.A.), Kidd
2021-02-10HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2021-02-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Talley, Moore, Davis, Mize, Luttrell, Townley, Bashore, Sims, Dills, Pae, Fetgatter, Lawson, Blancett, McDugle, Munson, West (Tammy), Cornwell, Manger, Roberts (Eric), Wolfley, Boles, Kerbs, Dollens, Ranson, Randleman, Roe, Brewer, Cruz, Boatman, McEntire, Waldron, Conley, Rosecrants, Wallace, Virgin
2021-02-10HouseCR; Do Pass Technology Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Technology
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Walke, West (Josh)
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback