OK HB1599 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage; creating the Preservation of Sovereignty and Marriage Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; creating the Preservation of Sovereignty and Marriage Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2015-02-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2015-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Kern
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback