OK HB1583 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1583
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; consolidation of the Office of the State Bond Advisor with the Office of the State Treasurer; effective date.
Title
Public finance; consolidation of the Office of the State Bond Advisor with the Office of the State Treasurer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/01/2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4 |
2017-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-18 | House | Remove Senator Loveless as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Fields |
2017-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Treat, David, Dahm, Marlatt, Floyd, Bass |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Griffin |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sparks |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunnington, Virgin, Bennett (Forrest), Echols, Osborn (Leslie), Martin |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1583 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 695 | 10A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |