OK HB1570 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil procedure; statute of limitations for civil actions; striking gross negligence standard for certain damages; court costs and attorney fees; Discovery Code; limitations on scope of discovery; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; statute of limitations for civil actions; striking gross negligence standard for certain damages; court costs and attorney fees; Discovery Code; limitations on scope of discovery; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2017
2017-05-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-25SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2017-05-25SenateCCR adopted
2017-05-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2017-05-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Sparks
2017-05-24SenateCCR read
2017-05-24HouseTo Senate
2017-05-24HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2017-05-24HouseCCR adopted
2017-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2017-05-09SenateConference granted, SCs named Holt, Newberry, Leewright, Daniels, Bice, Sparks, Floyd
2017-05-04HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-04-27HouseSA's received
2017-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2017-04-26SenateTitle restored
2017-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2017-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
2017-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1570&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1570%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1570%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1570%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1570%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1570%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1570%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1570%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1570%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1570%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1570_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1570_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback