OK HB1559 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Civil procedure; attorney-client privilege; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; attorney-client privilege; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 35 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 35 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2011-05-17 | Ayes: 35 Nays: 64 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR failed of adoption | |
2011-05-13 | Title restored | |
2011-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-03 | SCs changed David to Nichols | |
2011-04-27 | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Sykes, Crain, David, Sparks, Laster | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-15 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Jordan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |