OK HB1540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; clarifying scope of certain definitions; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; clarifying scope of certain definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1540 (Carry Over) 2023-04-19 - Placed on General Order