OK HB1532 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1532

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; modifying tax credits for certain clean burning motor vehicle fuel property. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; modifying tax credits for certain clean burning motor vehicle fuel property. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseSA's received
2018-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
2018-04-26SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom
2018-04-26SenateTitle restored
2018-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-04-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3
2017-03-21HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2017-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-02HouseTitle stricken
2017-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-02-14HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Montgomery
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1532 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1532&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1532%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1532%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1532%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1532%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1532%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1532%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1532_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1532_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback