OK HB1516 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1516
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; qualifications of governing body members; specifying residency requirement be met at time of candidacy and election; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; qualifications of governing body members; specifying residency requirement be met at time of candidacy and election; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lundy Kiger [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 17 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kiger |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1516 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019