OK HB1516 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; crime of stalking; updating language; forfeiture of unlawful proceeds; modifying circumstances for forfeiture; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; crime of stalking; updating language; forfeiture of unlawful proceeds; modifying circumstances for forfeiture; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2015-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Barrington, Griffin, Shaw, Floyd, Pittman, Treat |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Ritze, Biggs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-03 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Peterson |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |