OK HB1516 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Used Motor Vehicle and Parts Commission; creating the Crusher Act; scrap metal dealers; effective date.
Title
Used Motor Vehicle and Parts Commission; creating the Crusher Act; scrap metal dealers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2 CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 17 |
2014-05-21 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove Senator Brecheen as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Barrington |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Shelton, Ritze, McDaniel (Jeannie), Pittman |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove as author Representative(s) Nelson |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove Representative Peterson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jackson |
2014-05-16 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCs removed Anderson, Barrington, Brecheen, Brown, Ellis, Johnson (Constance) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Further conference granted |
2014-05-05 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2013-05-21 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Shumate |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Brecheen, Barrington, Brown, Anderson, Johnson (Constance), Ellis |
2013-05-06 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Floyd, Matthews, Scott |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-11 | House | Amended |
2013-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie), Pittman, Virgin, Inman, Sherrer, Shelton, Dorman |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2013-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Peterson, Nelson |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 592 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 592 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |