OK HB1478 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1478
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Discrimination; Office of Civil Rights Enforcement prohibiting forwarding of names on complaints; requiring Attorney General perform certain actions for complaints; effective date.
Title
Discrimination; Office of Civil Rights Enforcement prohibiting forwarding of names on complaints; requiring Attorney General perform certain actions for complaints; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 |
2017-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 10 |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Matthews (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Young |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1478 (Carry Over) 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |