OK HB1465 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; changing date for determining age for school attendance; allowing certain students to enroll if they are screened and determined to be ready; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; changing date for determining age for school attendance; allowing certain students to enroll if they are screened and determined to be ready; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-02-28 Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Brinkley, Brecheen, McAffrey, Eason McIntyre
2012-02-22 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education
2011-05-17 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2011-05-04 Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Stanislawski, Nichols, Eason McIntyre, Paddack
2011-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education
2011-04-26 SA's received
2011-04-26 Engrossed to House
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2011-04-25 Title stricken
2011-04-25 General Order, Amended
2011-04-05 Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2011-03-21 Second Reading referred to Education
2011-03-15 First Reading
2011-03-15 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-14 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-14 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16
2011-03-14 General Order
2011-03-02 Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2011-03-02 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
2011-03-02 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Common Education
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Johnson
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701114New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback