OK HB1464 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1464
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; streets and roads; modifying certain population requirement; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; streets and roads; modifying certain population requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Amended |
2017-03-02 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-02 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017