OK HB1464 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; procedures; Oklahoma Tax Commission; venue of civil actions; appeals; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; procedures; Oklahoma Tax Commission; venue of civil actions; appeals; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-02 Conference granted, GCCA
2012-02-22 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2011-05-17 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2011-05-17 SCs named Sykes, Bingman, Schulz, Stanislawski, Rice, Laster
2011-05-17 Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
2011-05-11 SCs named GCCA
2011-05-11 SCs removed Sykes, Jolley, Treat, Stanislawski, Ivester, Ellis
2011-05-04 Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Jolley, Treat, Stanislawski, Ivester, Ellis
2011-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2011-04-27 SA's received
2011-04-27 Engrossed to House
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-04-26 General Order, Considered
2011-03-31 Title stricken
2011-03-31 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2011-03-21 Second Reading referred to Finance
2011-03-15 First Reading
2011-03-15 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-14 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-14 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 21
2011-03-14 Amended
2011-03-14 Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds
2011-03-14 General Order
2011-02-22 Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
2011-02-22 CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Johnson
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
682261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback