OK HB1462 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing for ten-year registration certificates; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing for ten-year registration certificates; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2013-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett, Pittman |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |