OK HB1427 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; Out-of-State Tax Collections Enforcement Act of 2017; out-of-state field office; staffing levels; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; Out-of-State Tax Collections Enforcement Act of 2017; out-of-state field office; staffing levels; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2017
2017-05-04HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-04HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12
2017-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-25HouseSA's received
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
2017-04-24SenateTitle restored
2017-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-04-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2017-03-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
2017-03-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Newton
2017-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-02HouseTitle stricken
2017-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2017-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey
2017-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-02-16HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hilbert
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1427&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1427%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1427%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1427%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1427%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1427%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1427%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1427%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1427_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1427_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback