OK HB1409 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; increasing time period of voluntary and informed consent prior to abortion; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; increasing time period of voluntary and informed consent prior to abortion; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06HouseApproved by Governor 05/06/2015
2015-05-04HouseSent to Governor
2015-05-04SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-04HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-04-30HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-04-30HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 3
2015-04-30HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Silk, Brecheen
2015-04-30HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart
2015-04-30HouseSA's read, adopted
2015-04-22HouseSA's received
2015-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
2015-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-04-06Senatecoauthored by Loveless
2015-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2015-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-02-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-02-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan
2015-02-16HouseMotion expired
2015-02-11HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Billy
2015-02-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 9
2015-02-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jolley
2015-02-11HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2015-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Christian, Faught, Brumbaugh, Kern
2015-02-11HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
2015-02-04HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Billy
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631738New CodeSee Bill Text
631738mNew CodeSee Bill Text
631746New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1409&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1409%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1409%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1409%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1409%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1409%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1409%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB1409%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1409_votes.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback