OK HB1400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; defining terms; requiring yearly selection of certain pilot program; effective date.
Title
Transportation; defining terms; requiring yearly selection of certain pilot program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 1 |
2019-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-25 | House | Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-25 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1400 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations