OK HB1391 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1391
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; definition; post-retirement employment; effective dates; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; definition; post-retirement employment; effective dates; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Tedford |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Howard |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Howard; authored by Senator Alvord |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-07 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Bashore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cantrell |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Bashore |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1391 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act