OK HB1389 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; Smoking in Public Places and Indoor Workplaces Act; including lighted marijuana and electronic cigarettes in definition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; Smoking in Public Places and Indoor Workplaces Act; including lighted marijuana and electronic cigarettes in definition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateEmergency added
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Safety
2019-02-26HouseWithdrawn from Public Health Committee
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-20HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Townley
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback