OK HB1388 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nuisances; providing requirements to determine established date of operation for certain agricultural activities; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuisances; providing requirements to determine established date of operation for certain agricultural activities; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/16/2017
2017-05-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-10SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-10HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-09HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2017-05-09HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-27HouseSA's received
2017-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2017-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2017-03-21Senatecoauthored by Sanders
2017-03-21Senatecoauthored by Biggs
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4
2017-03-20HouseAuthored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author)
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Pfeiffer
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5011New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1388&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1388%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1388%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1388%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1388%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1388%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1388%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1388_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1388_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback