OK HB1373 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; requiring certain entities list criminal records that disqualify applicant from licensure; modifying various requirements for licensure; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; requiring certain entities list criminal records that disqualify applicant from licensure; modifying various requirements for licensure; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseApproved by Governor 05/14/2019
2019-05-08HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
2019-05-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
2019-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2
2019-03-04HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2019-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Kiger
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Taylor
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1373&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1373%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1373%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1373%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1373%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1373%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1373%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1373%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1373_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1373_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback