OK HB1372 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1372
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; State Board of Agriculture and Tourism and Recreation Commission; mandating transfer of the Forest Heritage Center; effective date.
Title
State government; State Board of Agriculture and Tourism and Recreation Commission; mandating transfer of the Forest Heritage Center; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9 |
2017-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Tadlock |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1372 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations