OK HB1359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; establishing Foster Care System Improvement Task Force; emergency.
Title
Children; establishing Foster Care System Improvement Task Force; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Rep. Ron Peters [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor 04/06/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-30 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-30 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-30 | coauthored by Eason McIntyre, Brecheen | |
2011-03-30 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-23 | coauthored by David, Holt, Treat | |
2011-03-23 | coauthored by Brumbaugh, Pittman | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-23 | First Reading | |
2011-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | |
2011-02-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Derby, Walker, Peterson, Nelson, Nollan | |
2011-02-22 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby, Denney, Dorman | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |