OK HB1358 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; authorizing issuance of protective orders against incarcerated persons; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; authorizing issuance of protective orders against incarcerated persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-18 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-04-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | coauthored by Kern | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Amended | |
2011-03-15 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-02-15 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 60 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |