OK HB1341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; mixed beverage license; authorizing holders of a mixed beverage license to hold certain other licenses; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; mixed beverage license; authorizing holders of a mixed beverage license to hold certain other licenses; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2019
2019-05-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-16SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
2019-05-16SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-09HouseTitle restored
2019-05-09HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Coleman, Leewright, Pugh, Bergstrom, Brooks, Young
2019-04-30HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-04SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1341&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1341%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1341%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1341%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1341%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1341%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1341%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1341%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1341_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1341_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback