OK HB1321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency room services; creating the Rural Emergency Room Access to Care and Facilities Improvements Act; effective date; emergency.
Title
Emergency room services; creating the Rural Emergency Room Access to Care and Facilities Improvements Act; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1321 (Carry Over) 2023-04-12 - Title stricken