OK HB1304 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Technology; creating the Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology; creating the Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
2011-05-19 Sent to Governor
2011-05-19 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-19 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2011-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-18 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16
2011-05-18 CCR adopted, GCCA
2011-05-18 CCR read, GCCA
2011-05-17 To Senate
2011-05-17 Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 31; Ayes: 57 Nays: 34
2011-05-17 Ayes: 63 Nays: 29
2011-05-17 CCR adopted
2011-05-16 Emergency added
2011-05-16 Title restored
2011-05-16 CCR submitted
2011-05-03 Conference granted, GCCA
2011-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2011-04-27 SA's received
2011-04-27 Engrossed to House
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 18
2011-04-26 General Order, Considered
2011-04-07 Title stricken
2011-04-07 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2011-03-23 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2011-03-21 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-17 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-17 Motion expired
2011-03-16 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby
2011-03-16 Emergency failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 39
2011-03-16 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby
2011-03-16 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 45
2011-03-16 Amended
2011-03-16 Coauthored by Senator(s) Brinkley
2011-03-16 Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2011-03-16 General Order
2011-02-28 Emergency added
2011-02-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Derby
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
575082cNew CodeSee Bill Text
623411New CodeSee Bill Text
623412New CodeSee Bill Text
623427New CodeSee Bill Text
62351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62354Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62358Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62359Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback