OK HB1302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1302
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; relating to alcoholic beverage licensing; exempting certain types of events from certain licensure requirements; effective date; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; relating to alcoholic beverage licensing; exempting certain types of events from certain licensure requirements; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14; Ayes: 72 Nays: 12 |
2017-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1302 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 537 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 2 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 2 | 129 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 6 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 6 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |