OK HB1284 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; state tax credits; reports; revenue estimates; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; state tax credits; reports; revenue estimates; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. James Lockhart [D] |
Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer, Lockhart, Hilliard, Tibbs | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2011-05-04 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |