OK HB1269 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expungement of criminal records and commutations; authorizing filing of petition; suspended sentence; updating language; procedures; commutations and pardons; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expungement of criminal records and commutations; authorizing filing of petition; suspended sentence; updating language; procedures; commutations and pardons; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
2019-05-23SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Matthews
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Goodwin
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Fugate
2019-05-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Sims
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-16HouseTo Senate
2019-05-16HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14
2019-05-16HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseEnacting clause restored
2019-05-14HouseTitle restored
2019-05-14HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Bice, Daniels, Coleman, Jech, Floyd, Brooks, Shaw, Matthews
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-10SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Provenzano
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Young
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 22
2019-03-11HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh)
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dunnington, Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1269&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1269%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1269%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1269%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1269%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1269%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1269%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1269%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1269_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1269_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback