OK HB1251 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; rural water districts to take water from certain sources without fee or charge.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; rural water districts to take water from certain sources without fee or charge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | |
2011-04-26 | Title restored | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-04 | coauthored by Fields | |
2011-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 | |
2011-03-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught | |
2011-03-07 | General Order | |
2011-02-22 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-22 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Rousselot | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |