OK HB1237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1237
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
United States; providing for review of presidential executive orders and federal actions; prohibiting implementation of unconstitutional actions; effective date.
Title
United States; providing for review of presidential executive orders and federal actions; prohibiting implementation of unconstitutional actions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Merrick |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Davis, Miller, ODonnell, Olsen, Dills, Moore, Roberts (Dustin), Pfeiffer, McDugle, Burns, Ford, West (Tammy), Roe, Sims, May, Dempsey, Dobrinski, CrosswhiteHader, Stearman, Conley, Townley, Bashore, Lowe (Dick), Patzkowsky, West (Kevin), Worthen, Manger, Grego, Sterling, Sneed, Hardin (David), Martinez, Marti, Boles, Luttrell, Osburn, Frix, Kerbs, Vancuren, Johns, Russ, West (Rick), Baker, Hill, Gann, Cornwell, Steagall, Lawson, Talley, Stark, Hilbert, Culver, Smith, Randleman, Mize, Wolfley, Kendrix, Caldwell (Trey), Echols, Roberts (Eric), Humphrey, Lepak |
2021-04-20 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1237 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Coauthored by Senator Jett