OK HB1233 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to issue a one-year provisional certificate in certain special education areas; certificate; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to issue a one-year provisional certificate in certain special education areas; certificate; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] |
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-20 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-15 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted, GCCA |
2013-05-13 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Simpson |
2013-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 3 |
2013-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin, Nollan |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 13 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 187 | New Code | See Bill Text |