OK HB1228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; professional development programs; requiring annual training program for dyslexia awareness; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; professional development programs; requiring annual training program for dyslexia awareness; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Governor 04/04/2019
2019-04-02HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-01HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-04-01SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Bice
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Haste
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall
2019-03-11Senatecoauthored by Hicks
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Kirt
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-02-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Albright, West (Josh), Boles, Townley, Lawson
2019-02-21HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-19HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-02-19HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Sanders
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback