OK HB1227 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Vetoed 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Vetoed 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; transferring Ardmore Higher Education Program to the Regional University System of Oklahoma; effective date.
Title
Higher education; transferring Ardmore Higher Education Program to the Regional University System of Oklahoma; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Rusty Farley [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Flr Substitute (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Flr Substitute (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Vetoed 04/29/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2011-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 30 | |
2011-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Faught | |
2011-04-21 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Roan | |
2011-04-21 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-19 | SA's received | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2011-04-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Simpson | |
2011-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 | |
2011-04-18 | Title restored | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-18 | coauthored by Allen | |
2011-04-18 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-04-05 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-04-05 | coauthored by Hardin, Roberts (Dustin), Farley | |
2011-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-05 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Farley | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2011-02-22 | First Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-21 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2011-02-21 | General Order | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 57 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3213 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3515 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3980 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |