OK HB1221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Oklahoma Veterans of Foreign Wars Specialty License Plate; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Oklahoma Veterans of Foreign Wars Specialty License Plate; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1221 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Title stricken