OK HB1182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - coauthored by Grego
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - coauthored by Grego
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion.
Title
Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] |
Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] |
Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | coauthored by Grego |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Allen; authored by Senator Daniels |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dills |
2020-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 21 |
2020-02-06 | House | Amended |
2020-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard |
2020-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), Gann, Humphrey, Smith, Boles, Hardin (David), Roberts (Sean), Roberts (Dustin), Davis, Russ, Steagall, Stark, Taylor, CrosswhiteHader, Townley, McCall, McDugle, Miller, Hilbert, Sims, Lepak, Lawson, Vancuren, Sanders, Hill, Randleman |
2020-02-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)