OK HB1169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1169
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; amusement rides; modifying definition; authorizing Commissioner of Labor to determine date of inspections; effective date.
Title
Labor; amusement rides; modifying definition; authorizing Commissioner of Labor to determine date of inspections; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by Governor 05/25/2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-16 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-16 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Yen, Newberry, Leewright, Bergstrom, Kidd, Sparks, Pittman |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1169 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017