OK HB1151 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1151
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child custody; allowing court to consider certain evidence to make determination on shared parenting; requiring findings of fact and conclusions of law after final hearing; effective date.
Title
Child custody; allowing court to consider certain evidence to make determination on shared parenting; requiring findings of fact and conclusions of law after final hearing; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Sen. Brent Howard [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 |
2021-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Roberts (Sean) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1151 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021