OK HB1123 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; making certain acts of trespassing and vandalism unlawful; providing penalties; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; making certain acts of trespassing and vandalism unlawful; providing penalties; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/03/2017
2017-04-27HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-27SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-27HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-26HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-26SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-26SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2017-04-26SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2017-04-26SenateEmergency clause restored
2017-04-26SenateTitle restored
2017-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-06SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-03-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-02-28HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-02-28HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 24; Ayes: 68 Nays: 25
2017-02-28HouseEmergency added
2017-02-28HouseAmended
2017-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
2017-02-28HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Biggs
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback